IL SB3189 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that certain property located in Bloom, Bremen, Calumet, Rich, Thornton, or Worth Township may be certified as southland reactivation property. Provides that, beginning with the first tax year after the property is certified as southland reactivation property and continuing through the twelfth tax year after the property is certified as southland reactivation property, the property shall be valued at 50% of the base year equalized assessed value. Provides that the base year is the last tax year prior to the date of the application for southland reactivation designation during which the property was occupied and assessed and had an equalized assessed value. Sets forth the maximum aggregate tax liability for property that has been certified as southland reactivation property. Effective immediately.
Title
PROP TX-SOUTHLAND REACTIVATION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-08 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-27 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1010 |
2022-05-27 | Senate | Effective Date May 27, 2022 |
2022-05-27 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2022-04-08 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 054-000-000 |
2022-04-05 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government; 009-000-000 |
2022-04-05 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government |
2022-04-04 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2022-04-04 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Patrick J. Joyce |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John Connor |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - March 31, 2022 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2022-03-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-006-001 |
2022-03-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-28 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2022-03-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2022-03-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2022-03-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2022-03-24 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2022-03-24 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2022-03-24 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Ozinga |
2022-03-24 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2022-03-24 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2022-03-24 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-24 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 018-000-000 |
2022-03-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Revenue & Finance Committee; by Voice Vote |
2022-03-23 | House | Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2022-03-23 | House | Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. William Davis |
2022-03-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2022-03-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2022-03-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Patrick J. Joyce |
2022-03-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2022-03-07 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2022-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2022-02-16 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2022-02-16 | House | Arrived in House |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 049-005-000 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 15, 2022 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 8, 2022 |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Do Pass Revenue; 009-000-000 |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-01-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 105 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 120 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |