IL SB3186 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Finance Act. Provides all moneys collected and payable to the Department of State Police under specified provision of the Unified Code of Corrections shall be deposited into the State Police Operations Assistance Fund. Dissolves the State Police Streetgang-Related Crime Fund and provides that the remaining balance of the Fund shall be transferred into the State Police Operations Assistance Fund. Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Dissolves the Sex Offender Investigation Fund and provides that the remaining balance shall be transferred into the Offender Registration Fund. Amends the Murderer and Violent Offender Against Youth Registration Act. Dissolves the Murderer and Violent Offender Against Youth Registration Fund and provides that the remaining balance shall be transferred into the Offender Registration Fund. Amends the Illinois Act on the Aging. Removes provisions requiring the Department on Aging to delay Community Care Program services until an applicant is determined eligible for medical assistance under specified provisions of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Makes other changes in various Acts. Effective immediately.
Title
FINANCE-FUNDS & MANDATES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-09-30 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady |
2018-05-31 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-28 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2018-05-28 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Executive Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2018-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2018-05-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William Davis |
2018-05-18 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018 |
2018-05-17 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. William Davis |
2018-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2018-05-08 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2018-05-07 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Robert Rita |
2018-04-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-27 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-27 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2018-04-27 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Althoff |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - State Government |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - State Government |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to State Government |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2018 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 10, 2018 |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Do Pass State Government; 008-000-000 |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |