IL SB3182 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Public Health Committee
Pending: House Public Health Committee
Hearing: May 2 @ 9:00 am in Room D-1 Stratton Building
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Public Health Committee
Pending: House Public Health Committee
Hearing: May 2 @ 9:00 am in Room D-1 Stratton Building
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Hospital Licensing Act. Provides that a hospital having custody of a fetus following a spontaneous fetal death occurring during or after a gestation period of at least 20 completed weeks must notify the gestational parent of the parent's right to receive a certificate of birth resulting in stillbirth. Amends the Vital Records Act. Provides that after each fetal death that occurs in the State after a gestation period of at least 20 (rather than 26) completed weeks, or in cases where gestational age is uncertain, where the fetus weighs at least 350 grams, the person who files a fetal death certificate shall also prepare a certificate of birth resulting in stillbirth. Requires the person who files a fetal death certificate to notify the gestational parent of the stillborn of that parent's right to request and receive a certificate of birth resulting in stillbirth. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
BIRTH CERTIFICATE-STILLBIRTH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | Assigned to Public Health Committee |
2024-04-24 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen |
2024-04-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-10 | House | First Reading |
2024-04-09 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2024-04-09 | House | Arrived in House |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 20, 2024 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2024 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Judiciary; 008-000-000 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Lakesia Collins |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Lakesia Collins |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
210 | 85 | 11.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
210 | 85 | 11.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
410 | 535 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 535 | 20.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |