IL SB3179 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1098
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1098
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Human Services Act. Adds additional duties for the Inspector General for the Department of Human Services. Defines "substantiated" to mean that there is clear and convincing evidence (rather than a preponderance) to support the allegation of abuse, neglect, or financial exploitation. Amends the Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Administrative Act. Defines "nurse-training". Changes the criteria for non-licensed authorized direct care staff. Provides that within one year after the bill's effective date, the Department shall prepare a report that identifies any efficiencies or improvements in Department operations, the oversight of agencies, and the reduction or elimination of duplicative activities. The report shall include a quality assessment of the feasibility of combining the functions of the Division of Developmental Disabilities' Bureau of Quality Management and the Department's Bureau of Accreditation, Licensure, and Certification. Upon the report's completion, the Department shall post the report on the Department's website and submit it to the General Assembly and Governor. Amends the Community-Integrated Living Arrangements Licensure and Certification Act. Provides that using contemporary data gathered on reports of allegations of abuse, neglect, and financial exploitation, the Department shall establish a process by which the Department requires responses from agencies that annually report a number of allegations that are 2 or more standard deviations from the mean for all agencies. Provides that if an agency has documented evidence and has determined that the agency cannot adequately staff a community-integrated living arrangement, then the agency may take immediate steps to close the community-integrated living arrangement. Effective immediately.
Title
DHS&CILA-SERVICES-DEV DISABLED
Sponsors
Sen. Laura Murphy [D] | Sen. Julie Morrison [D] | Sen. Patricia Van Pelt [D] | Rep. Michelle Mussman [D] |
Sen. Sara Feigenholtz [D] | Sen. Laura Fine [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-26 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1098 |
2018-08-26 | Senate | Effective Date August 26, 2018 |
2018-08-26 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-004-000 |
2018-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-24 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2018-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2018-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-24 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 012-000-000 |
2018-05-18 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018 |
2018-05-17 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2018-05-17 | House | Substitute House Sponsorship Request Accepted No Action Taken by Rules |
2018-05-09 | House | Substitute House Sponsorship Request Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-09 | House | Substitute House Sponsorship Request Filed Pursuant Rule 37(c) - Sen. Laura Murphy |
2018-05-07 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2018-04-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-26 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Scott Drury |
2018-04-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2018 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Murphy |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Human Services; 007-000-000 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Human Services |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Human Services; 010-000-000 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Human Services |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 1305 | 1-17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 1705 | 15.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 1705 | 18.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
210 | 135 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
210 | 135 | 9.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |