IL SB3166 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Video Gaming Act. Provides that the Illinois Gaming Board may grant licenses to permit video gaming in a licensed veterans establishment within a municipality or unincorporated area of a county that has prohibited video gaming. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VIDEO GAMING-VETERANS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 41 N: 5 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-07HouseTo Gaming Subcommittee
2018-05-07HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2018-05-02HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2018-04-26HouseArrived in House
2018-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 041-005-000
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 24, 2018
2018-04-23SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 13, 2018
2018-04-11SenateDo Pass Gaming; 012-001-001
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Gaming
2018-02-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-16SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-16SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2304027Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback