IL SB3149 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0829
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0829
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Higher Education Student Assistance Act. Requires the Illinois Student Assistance Commission to annually include information about the Child Care Assistance Program and the federal dependent care allowance in the language that schools are required to provide to students eligible for Monetary Award Program grants. Specifies the information that must be included. Provides that an institution of higher learning that participates in the Monetary Award Program shall provide, at a minimum, the information to all students who are enrolled, or who are accepted for enrollment and are intending to enroll, and who have been identified by the Commission as Monetary Award Program-eligible at the institution. Provides that an institution of higher learning shall also provide the information to any student identified by the institution of higher learning as a student with dependents. Provides that an institution of higher learning may designate a public benefits liaison or single point person to assist students in taking the necessary steps to obtain public benefits if eligible. Requires the Commission to adopt rules to implement the provisions on or before October 1, 2022. Effective immediately.
Title
HIGHER ED-CHILD CARE RESOURCES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-13 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0829 |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Effective Date May 13, 2022 |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2022-04-01 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2022-03-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2022-03-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2022-03-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-16 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 010-000-000 |
2022-03-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2022-03-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2022-03-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2022-03-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado |
2022-03-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2022-03-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2022-03-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2022-03-07 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2022-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2022-02-16 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2022-02-16 | House | Arrived in House |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 15, 2022 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 10, 2022 |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Do Pass Higher Education; 012-000-000 |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John Connor |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Assigned to Higher Education |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-01-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Celina Villanueva |