IL SB3136 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on November 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-29 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1130
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on November 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-29 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1130
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Police Act and the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that any person employed by the Department of State Police or the Department of Corrections who tests positive in accordance with established Departmental drug testing procedures for any substance prohibited by the Cannabis Control Act, the Illinois Controlled Substances Act, or the Methamphetamine Control and Community Protection Act may (rather than shall) be discharged from employment. Provides that refusal to submit to a drug test, ordered in accordance with Departmental procedures, by any person employed by the respective Department may (rather than shall) be construed as a positive test, and the person shall be discharged from employment. Provides the changes made to these provisions shall apply to all pending and future incidents. Effective immediately.
Title
ZERO TOLERANCE-ST POLICE&DOC
Sponsors
Sen. John Cullerton [D] | Sen. Patricia Van Pelt [D] | Sen. Iris Martinez [D] | Rep. Barbara Currie [D] |
Rep. John Cabello [R] | Rep. Kelly Cassidy [D] | Rep. Steven Andersson [R] | Rep. Timothy Butler [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-11-27 - House - Motion in House (Y: 86 N: 24 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-11-14 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 50 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 61 N: 50 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-14 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 50 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 61 N: 50 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-29 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1130 |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Effective Date November 27, 2018 |
2018-11-27 | Senate | Amendatory Veto Overridden Both Houses |
2018-11-27 | House | Override Amendatory Veto - House Passed 086-024-000 |
2018-11-27 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2018-11-27 | House | Motion Filed Override Amendatory Veto Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2018-11-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Amendatory Veto |
2018-11-14 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-11-14 | Senate | Override Amendatory Veto - Senate Passed 050-004-000 |
2018-11-14 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2018-11-13 | Senate | Motion Filed Override Amendatory Veto Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2018-11-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Amendatory Veto November 14, 2018 |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Governor Amendatory Veto |
2018-06-26 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-28 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 061-050-001 |
2018-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2018-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2018-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-15 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 011-001-000 |
2018-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2018-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2018-05-08 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2018-05-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-08 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-30 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2018-04-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 24, 2018 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; J. Cullerton |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 17, 2018 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Executive; 017-000-000 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2610 | 12.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 3-7-2.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |