IL SB3131 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0840
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0840
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Utilities Act. Changes references to "hearing examiner" to references to "administrative law judge" throughout the Act. Repeals provisions concerning emission allowances, conducting a study on billing practices and policies, conducting a study on strategic options for changing the structure of energy service markets, conducting a study on the feasibility of wheeling electricity in the State, rules for recovering costs of canceled facilities, recovery of additional charges refunded to customers, conducting a study on implementing promotional rates for industrial and commercial customers, alternative rate regulations, and conducting a study on patterns of entry and exit for each relevant market for telecommunications services. Removes references to repealed provisions. Makes conforming changes in the High Speed Internet Services and Information Technology Act. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
UTILITIES-VARIOUS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-13 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0840 |
2018-08-13 | Senate | Effective Date August 13, 2018 |
2018-08-13 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 117-000-000 |
2018-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-24 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-24 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2018-05-18 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018 |
2018-05-08 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2018-04-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-27 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-27 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2018-04-27 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted; Rezin |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Rezin |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommend Do Adopt Energy and Public Utilities; 009-000-000 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Energy and Public Utilities; 009-000-000 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 24, 2018 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Assignments Refers to Energy and Public Utilities |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Energy and Public Utilities |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sue Rezin |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sue Rezin |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 17, 2018 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Do Pass Energy and Public Utilities; 008-000-000 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Energy and Public Utilities |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Energy and Public Utilities |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sue Rezin |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sue Rezin |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Energy and Public Utilities |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sue Rezin |