IL SB3130 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0825
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0825
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Children and Family Services Act. Replaces the definition of "post-adoption reunion services" with a definition of "search and reunion services". Requires the Department of Children and Family Services to provide a notice that includes a description of the Department's search and reunion services and an explanation of how to access those services to all youth in care, within 30 days after their 18th birthday and within 30 days prior to closure of their pending case if the case is closing after the youth's 18th birthday. Amends the Adoption Act. Provides that former youth in care who have been surrendered or adopted who are (i) between the ages of 18 and 21 and who are seeking contact or an exchange of information with siblings, birth relatives, former foster parents, or former foster siblings or (ii) over the age of 21 who are seeking contact with former foster parents or former foster siblings are not required to complete an Illinois Adoption Registry Application prior to commencement of the search. Allows a former youth in care who was surrendered or adopted to petition the court for appointment of a confidential intermediary for the purposes of obtaining identifying information or arranging contact with (i) siblings or birth relatives if the former youth in care is between the ages of 18 and 21 or (ii) former foster parents or foster siblings if the former youth in care is over the age of 21.
Title
ADOPTION-SEARCH & REUNION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-16 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0825 |
2022-05-16 | Senate | Effective Date July 1, 2023 |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2022-03-30 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Bos |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2022-03-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 |
2022-03-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-22 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Adoption & Child Welfare Committee; 006-000-000 |
2022-03-07 | House | Assigned to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee |
2022-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2022-02-16 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2022-02-16 | House | Arrived in House |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 15, 2022 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 8, 2022 |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Judiciary; 007-000-000 |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-01-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 505 | 7.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
750 | 50 | 18.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
750 | 50 | 18.3a | Amended Code | Citation Text |