IL SB3128 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-01 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0902
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-01 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0902
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the War on Terrorism Compensation Act. Includes recipients of the Afghanistan Campaign Medal and the Iraq Campaign Medal to the list of veterans entitled to receive compensation in the amount of $100 for their military service. Effective immediately.
Title
VETERANS-WAR ON TERROR COMP
Sponsors
Sen. Larry Bomke [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-01 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0902 | |
2010-06-01 | Effective Date June 1, 2010 | |
2010-06-01 | Governor Approved | |
2010-05-21 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-04-22 | Passed Both Houses | |
2010-04-22 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-001 | |
2010-04-22 | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Jim Watson | |
2010-04-20 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Rich Brauer | |
2010-04-20 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-04-20 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-04-15 | Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Jim Watson | |
2010-04-15 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Watson | |
2010-04-15 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti | |
2010-04-15 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe | |
2010-04-15 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael G. Connelly | |
2010-04-15 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ronald A. Wait | |
2010-04-15 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore | |
2010-04-15 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Watson | |
2010-04-15 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker | |
2010-04-15 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Sacia | |
2010-04-15 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard | |
2010-04-15 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps | |
2010-04-15 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz | |
2010-04-15 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Donald L. Moffitt | |
2010-04-15 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. JoAnn D. Osmond | |
2010-04-15 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry L. Mitchell | |
2010-04-15 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emily McAsey | |
2010-04-15 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joseph M. Lyons | |
2010-04-15 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Joyce | |
2010-04-15 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan A. Gordon | |
2010-04-15 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks | |
2010-04-15 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert F. Flider | |
2010-04-15 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham | |
2010-04-15 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lisa M. Dugan | |
2010-04-15 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Bost | |
2010-04-15 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia | |
2010-04-15 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-04-15 | Do Pass / Short Debate Veterans' Affairs Committee; 018-000-000 | |
2010-03-22 | Assigned to Veterans' Affairs Committee | |
2010-03-11 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-03-11 | First Reading | |
2010-03-11 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2010-03-11 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Raymond Poe | |
2010-03-11 | Arrived in House | |
2010-03-10 | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 | |
2010-03-09 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 10, 2010 | |
2010-03-09 | Second Reading | |
2010-03-04 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2010 | |
2010-03-04 | Do Pass State Government and Veterans Affairs; 008-000-000 | |
2010-02-24 | Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs | |
2010-02-08 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-02-08 | First Reading | |
2010-02-08 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Larry K. Bomke |