IL SB3114 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Liquor Control Act of 1934. Authorizes the issuance and renewal of a license to sell alcoholic liquor at premises located within 100 feet of a specific church and school located in the City of Chicago. Effective immediately.
Title
LIQUOR-SALE NEAR CHURCH/SCHOOL
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-03 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-18 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018 |
2018-05-08 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2018-05-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-08 | House | First Reading |
2018-05-03 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2018-05-03 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 047-000-000 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Aquino |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 012-000-000 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 24, 2018 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 17, 2018 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Executive; 017-000-000 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
235 | 5 | 6-11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |