IL SB3108 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1005
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1005
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Natural Resources Act, the Historic Preservation Act, and the Illinois State Agency Historic Resources Preservation Act. Requires the Illinois State Museum and Division of Historic Preservation of the Department of Natural Resources to collaborate and assist the Department of Resources exercise its duties under the Acts. Removes the authority of the Board of the Illinois State Museum to approve budget requests of the Illinois State Museum. Replaces references to the Historic Sites and Preservation Division of the Department with the Department of Natural Resources. Makes other changes. Effective Immediately.
Title
DNR-HISTORIC PRESERVATION-NAME
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-27 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1005 |
2022-05-27 | Senate | Effective Date May 27, 2022 |
2022-05-27 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2022-03-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 |
2022-03-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-16 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 008-000-000 |
2022-03-07 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2022-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2022-02-18 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock |
2022-02-16 | House | Arrived in House |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 15, 2022 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 8, 2022 |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Do Pass State Government; 007-000-000 |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-01-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Doris Turner |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 3405 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3405 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3405 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3405 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3405 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3405 | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3405 | 4.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3405 | 4.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 3405 | 5.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3405 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3420 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 801 | 1-25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 801 | 20-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |