IL SB3105 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-08 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-08 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Chicago Firefighter Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides for an annual increase in a retirement annuity at age 55 if the fireman was born before January 1, 1960 (was, before January 1, 1955). Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement. Effective immediately.
Title
PEN CD-ART 6-ANNUAL INCREASE
Sponsors
Sen. James DeLeo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-08 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | |
2010-03-04 | To Pensions & Investments Subcommittee on Pension Benefit Enhancements | |
2010-02-16 | Assigned to Pensions and Investments | |
2010-02-08 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-02-08 | First Reading | |
2010-02-08 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. James A. DeLeo |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3105&GAID=10&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/SB/09600SB3105.htm |