IL SB3100 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-15 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-15 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Landlord Retaliation Act. Provides that a landlord may not knowingly terminate a tenancy, increase rent, decrease services, bring or threaten to bring a lawsuit against a tenant for possession, or refuse to renew a lease or tenancy because the tenant has, in good faith: (1) complained of code violations applicable to the premises to a competent governmental agency, elected representative, or public official charged with the responsibility for enforcement of a building, housing, health, or similar code; (2) complained of a building, housing, health, or similar code violation or an illegal landlord practice to a community organization or the news media; (3) sought the assistance of a community organization or the news media to remedy a code violation or illegal landlord practice; (4) complained to or requested the landlord to make repairs to the premises as required by a building code, health ordinance, other rule or regulation, or residential rental agreement; (5) organized or become a member of a tenant's union or similar organization; (6) testified in any court or administrative proceeding concerning the condition of the premises; or (7) exercised any right or remedy provided by law. Sets forth remedies for a violation of the Act. Amends the Code of Civil Procedure to create an affirmative defense to an eviction action if the court finds that the tenant engaged in an action protected under the Landlord Retaliation Act. Repeals the Retaliatory Eviction Act.
Title
LANDLORD RETALIATION ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-15 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2024-02-21 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Property |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Karina Villa |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
735 | 5 | 9-106.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
765 | 720 | Act | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3100&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SB/10300SB3100.htm |