IL SB3096 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unemployment Insurance Act. Provides that the Department of Revenue shall maintain a public database, as provided under the State Tax Lien Registration Act, as a lien registry for the filing of liens upon employer assets authorized under the Unemployment Insurance Act. Provides that liens created before January 1, 2020 must be filed with the office of the recorder in the county where the subject property is located. Provides that on and after January 1, 2020 notice of the lien shall be filed in the lien registry. Sets forth the information required for the lien registry.
Title
UNEMPLOYMENT BENEFITS LIENS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-17 | House | To Unemployment Insurance Subcommittee |
2018-05-07 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2018-04-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-26 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2018-04-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Tracy |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Labor; 013-002-000 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Labor |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jil Tracy |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2018 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Labor |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Labor |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jil Tracy |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Labor; 012-001-000 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Labor |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jil Tracy |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Labor |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jil Tracy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
820 | 405 | 2401 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 405 | 2401.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
820 | 405 | 2402 | Amended Code | Citation Text |