IL SB3079 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-12 - Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2024
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-12 - Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2024
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Provides that, except during the 27 days immediately preceding any election, the State Board of Elections may furnish electronic voter registration records at a reasonable cost to any person who makes a sworn affidavit. Sets forth restrictions on the information that may be disclosed. Provides that voter registration records or data shall be limited to bona fide election purposes and shall not be used for any personal, private, or commercial purpose, including, but not limited to, the intimidation, threat, or deception of any person or the advertising, solicitation, sale, or marketing of products or services. Sets forth penalties for violations of these provisions. Makes conforming changes.
Title
ELEC CD-ELECTRONIC VOTER LISTS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-12 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2024 |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 To Subcommittee on Elections |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 3, 2024 |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 5, 2024 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2024-02-21 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Elections |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 4-106 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 4-8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 5-106 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 5-7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 6-106 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 6-35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |