IL SB3077 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0767
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0767
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Clinical Laboratory and Blood Bank Act. Provides that a clinical laboratory shall examine specimens at the request of a licensed physician assistant in accordance with the written supervision agreement required under the provision of the Physician Assistant Practice Act of 1987 concerning prescriptions, written supervision agreements, and prescriptive authority (rather than the written guidelines required under the provisions of the Physician Assistant Practice Act of 1987 concerning (1) the definition of "physician assistant" and (2) prescriptions, written supervision agreements, and prescriptive authority).
Title
BLOOD BANK ACT-SPECIMENS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-09 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-16 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0767 |
2014-07-16 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2015 |
2014-07-16 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2014-06-06 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-09 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2014-05-09 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 103-000-000 |
2014-05-07 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-07 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-04-30 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-04-30 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 010-000-000 |
2014-04-23 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2014-04-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-04-03 | House | First Reading |
2014-04-03 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Ron Sandack |
2014-04-01 | House | Arrived in House |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2014 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 19, 2014 |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Licensed Activities and Pensions; 008-000-000 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
210 | 25 | 7-101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |