IL SB3058 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Re-assigned to Higher Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Bridge Program for Underrepresented Students Act. Defines terms. Provides that each public university in this State may establish a Bridge Program for underrepresented students. Specifies program requirements. Provides that a public university that establishes a Bridge Program shall, on or before September 1, 2019 and on or before September 1 of each subsequent year, publish on its website and make available to the public a report on the Program. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

UNDERREPRESENTED STUDENTS ACT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-15SenateRe-assigned to Higher Education
2018-05-11SenateRule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-03SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-13SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018
2018-04-11SenatePostponed - Higher Education
2018-03-01SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2018-02-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-02-27SenatePostponed - Higher Education
2018-02-22SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-02-21SenateAssigned to Higher Education
2018-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2018-02-21SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-02-15SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2018-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback