IL SB3058 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Bridge Program for Underrepresented Students Act. Defines terms. Provides that each public university in this State may establish a Bridge Program for underrepresented students. Specifies program requirements. Provides that a public university that establishes a Bridge Program shall, on or before September 1, 2019 and on or before September 1 of each subsequent year, publish on its website and make available to the public a report on the Program. Effective immediately.
Title
UNDERREPRESENTED STUDENTS ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Re-assigned to Higher Education |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018 |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Postponed - Higher Education |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Postponed - Higher Education |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Higher Education |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3058&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3058.htm |