IL SB3044 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-28 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-28 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Liquor Control Act of 1934. Provides that a manufacturer, non-resident dealer, distributor, importing distributor, or foreign importer who owns or controls a trademark, brand, or name of an alcoholic liquor may amend or withdraw the registration for the alcoholic liquor, if he or she notifies, at least 30 days prior to the effective date of the amendment or withdrawal, any person to whom the manufacturer, non-resident dealer, distributor, importing distributor, or foreign importer has granted the right to sell the alcoholic liquor at wholesale of the specific trademark, brand, or name and the geographical area or areas for which the person's right is being amended or withdrawn. Upon the written request of all the affected parties, the 30-day notification requirement may be waived by the State Commission. Effective immediately.
Title
LIQUOR-TRADEMARK BRAND NAME
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-05-07 | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 28, 2010 | |
2010-05-05 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-05-05 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-04-22 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-04-22 | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 010-000-000 | |
2010-04-08 | Assigned to Executive Committee | |
2010-03-18 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-03-18 | First Reading | |
2010-03-18 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2010-03-18 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang | |
2010-03-18 | Arrived in House | |
2010-03-18 | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 | |
2010-03-17 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 18, 2010 | |
2010-03-17 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Munoz | |
2010-03-17 | Second Reading | |
2010-03-16 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 009-000-000 | |
2010-03-16 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive | |
2010-03-11 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2010-03-11 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz | |
2010-03-08 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2010 | |
2010-03-08 | Do Pass Executive; 011-000-000 | |
2010-02-24 | Assigned to Executive | |
2010-02-08 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-02-08 | First Reading | |
2010-02-08 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz |