IL SB3040 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-12 - Sponsor Removed Sen. Dan Kotowski
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Freedom of Information Act. Exempts from disclosure information relating to performance evaluations of law enforcement officers covered by the Illinois Law Enforcement Training and Standards Board and sworn peace officers employed by the State. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FOIA-POLICE EVALUATIONS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-12 Sponsor Removed Sen. Dan Kotowski
2010-03-08 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2010-02-25 Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan Kotowski
2010-02-24 To Executive Subcommittee on Ethics
2010-02-16 Assigned to Executive
2010-02-04 Referred to Assignments
2010-02-04 First Reading
2010-02-04 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback