IL SB3035 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Passed on July 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0765
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Passed on July 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0765
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Nursing Home Care Act. In a provision concerning the reimbursement of receivers by the Department of Public Health adds that a monitor may also be reimbursed. Provides that the Department of Public Health may reimburse the receiver or monitor for its expenses from funds appropriated to the Department by the General Assembly after funds contained in the Long Term Care Monitor/Receiver Fund not allocated for the costs associated with hiring and maintaining of surveyors have been exhausted (currently, after funds contained in the Long Term Care Monitor/Receiver Fund have been exhausted). Effective immediately.
Title
NURS HOME-RECEIVER REIMBURSE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-09 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-16 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0765 |
2014-07-16 | Senate | Effective Date July 16, 2014 |
2014-07-16 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2014-06-06 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-09 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2014-05-09 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 102-000-000 |
2014-05-07 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-07 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2014-04-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2014-04-30 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2014-04-30 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-04-30 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 010-000-000 |
2014-04-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2014-04-23 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2014-04-02 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2014-03-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-03-05 | House | First Reading |
2014-03-05 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2014-03-05 | House | Arrived in House |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan Kotowski |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 4, 2014 |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 27, 2014 |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Do Pass Public Health; 006-000-000 |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
210 | 45 | 3-511 | Amended Code | Citation Text |