IL SB3022 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-18 - Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Anthony
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-18 - Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Anthony
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Finance Act. Changes the repeal date of provisions concerning the Capital Development Board Revolving Fund to July 1, 2020 (currently, July 1, 2016). Amends the Capital Development Board Act. Makes a conforming change. Effective immediately.
Title
CDB REVOLVING FUND-REPEAL DATE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Anthony |
2016-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2016-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2016-05-12 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2016-05-05 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2016-04-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-21 | House | First Reading |
2016-04-21 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2016-04-21 | House | Arrived in House |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 20, 2016 |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 5, 2016 |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Do Pass State Government and Veterans Affairs; 007-000-000 |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-02-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 3105 | 9.02a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 105 | 5.857 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 105 | 6z-100 | Amended Code | Citation Text |