IL SB3004 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code with respect to the suspension and expulsion of pupils. Provides for the expulsion of pupils by removing a pupil from a school or educational setting for a period of more than 10 school days for posing a significant threat of imminent serious harm to other pupils or to staff (instead of providing for the expulsion of pupils guilty of gross disobedience or misconduct). Provides for the suspension of pupils by removing a pupil from a school or educational setting for a period of not more than 10 days for a serious act of misconduct (instead of providing for the suspension of pupils guilty of gross disobedience or misconduct); makes related changes. Sets forth limitations on out-of-school suspensions. Requires behavioral support services and alternative educational services to be provided to certain students. Provides that, unless otherwise required by statute for a specific criminal offense, a student may not be arrested or otherwise cited for a criminal offense committed during school hours while on school grounds, in a school vehicle, or at a school activity or school-sanctioned event unless the offense constitutes a felony or the student has committed an identical offense within the preceding 6 months. Requires reports to be made for certain incidents. Provides that students may not be counseled by any school employee to leave school voluntarily in order to avoid formal disciplinary proceedings or because of any other disciplinary concerns. Provides that a student may not be issued a monetary fine or fee as a disciplinary consequence. Provides for charter school and alternative school application.
Title
SCH CD-STUDENT DISCIPLINE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Re-referred to Assignments; Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 1, 2014 |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Education |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Education |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 8, 2014 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 27, 2014 |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Education; 009-005-000 |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Postponed - Education |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Postponed - Education |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Postponed - Education |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. William Delgado |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-22.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 13A-11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 27A-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 34-19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |