IL SB2964 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-01 - Bill Dead - Amendatory Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-01 - Bill Dead - Amendatory Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Prevailing Wage Act. Provides that the prevailing wage shall not be less than the rate that prevails for similar work performed under collective bargaining agreements in the locality provided that the agreements cover at least 30% of the workers. Provides that, if bargaining agreements do not exist in the locality, the Department of Labor shall ascertain the prevailing wage to be paid under the Act. Applies to public works performed without a written contract. Requires that the Department publish prevailing wages schedules on its website.
Title
PREV WAGE BONA FIDE LABOR ORG
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-11-29 - House - Motion in House (Y: 70 N: 42 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-16 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 41 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 72 N: 40 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 38 N: 17 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-16 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 41 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 72 N: 40 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 38 N: 17 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-01 | Senate | Bill Dead - Amendatory Veto |
2016-11-29 | House | Override Amendatory Veto - House Lost 070-042-002 |
2016-11-29 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2016-11-16 | House | Motion Filed Override Amendatory Veto Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2016-11-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Amendatory Veto |
2016-11-16 | House | Arrived in House |
2016-11-16 | Senate | Override Amendatory Veto - Senate Passed 041-017-000 |
2016-11-16 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2016-11-15 | Senate | Motion Filed Override Amendatory Veto Sen. Don Harmon |
2016-11-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Amendatory Veto November 16, 2016 |
2016-07-22 | Senate | Governor Amendatory Veto |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2016-05-18 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 072-040-002 |
2016-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2016-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2016-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2016-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2016-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2016-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Smiddy |
2016-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2016-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2016-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2016-05-18 | House | Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed |
2016-05-17 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-17 | House | Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed |
2016-05-16 | House | State Debt Impact Note Filed |
2016-05-16 | House | Pension Note Filed |
2016-05-16 | House | Judicial Note Filed |
2016-05-11 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-11 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 016-007-000 |
2016-05-02 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2016-04-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-21 | House | First Reading |
2016-04-21 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2016-04-21 | House | Arrived in House |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 038-017-000 |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 21, 2016 |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 011-003-000 |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Re-referred to Executive |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 22, 2016 |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Postponed - Labor |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Labor |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-02-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
820 | 130 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 130 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 130 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 130 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 130 | 8 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
820 | 130 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |