IL SB2953 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Automotive Repair Act. Requires an automotive repair facility to post charges for labor, storage, parts, and diagnosis.
Title
AUTO REPAIR ACT-POST CHARGES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-07-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Judiciary |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2018 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 11, 2018 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Judiciary; 010-000-000 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Judiciary |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton |