IL SB2952 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1093
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1093
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Controlled Substances Act. Provides that the Department of Human Services, in consultation with the Advisory Committee, shall adopt rules allowing licensed prescribers or pharmacists who have registered to access the Prescription Monitoring Program to authorize a licensed or non-licensed designee (rather than any designee) employed in that licensed prescriber's office or licensed pharmacist's pharmacy and who has received training in the federal Health Insurance Portability and Accountability Act to consult the Prescription Monitoring Program on their behalf. Requires the Clinical Director of the Prescription Monitoring Program to select 6 members (rather than 5 members), 3 physicians, 2 pharmacists, and one dentist, of the Prescription Monitoring Program Advisory Committee to serve as members of the peer review subcommittee. Effective immediately.
Title
CONTROL SUB-PMP&ADV COMMITTEE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-26 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1093 |
2018-08-26 | Senate | Effective Date August 26, 2018 |
2018-08-26 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-06-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 054-000-000 |
2018-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Public Health; 006-000-000 |
2018-05-28 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Public Health |
2018-05-28 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-28 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Melinda Bush |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 - May 29, 2018 |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 |
2018-05-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2018-05-25 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000 |
2018-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2018-05-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 012-000-000 |
2018-05-23 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee |
2018-05-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2018-05-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee |
2018-05-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2018-05-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-16 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 012-000-000 |
2018-05-08 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2018-05-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-08 | House | First Reading |
2018-05-03 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2018-05-03 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted; Bush |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Bush |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Public Health; 006-000-000 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Public Health |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2018 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Bush |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Public Health; 007-000-000 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Public Health |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 28, 2018 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Do Pass Public Health; 009-000-000 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 570 | 316 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 570 | 320 | Amended Code | Citation Text |