IL SB2952 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-31 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-31 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Administrative Act and the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that the Department of Human Services shall establish reimbursement rates which build toward livable wages for front line personnel in residential and day programs serving persons with intellectual and developmental disabilities, including but not limited to intermediate care facilities for persons with developmental disabilities, community integrated living arrangements, developmental training programs, employment, and other residential and day programs for persons with intellectual and developmental disabilities supported by State funds or funding under Title XIX of the federal Social Security Act. Provides that the Department shall increase rates and reimbursements so that direct support persons earn a base wage of not less than $15 per hour and so that other front line personnel earn a commensurate wage. Defines "front line personnel". Effective immediately.
Title
DEV DISABLED-DSP-WAGES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-31 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2016 |
2016-05-13 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 27, 2016 |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 13, 2016 |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 20, 2016 |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 14, 2016 |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Do Pass Human Services; 006-001-000 |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 22, 2016 |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-02-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 1705 | 55.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
305 | 5 | 5-5.4i | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2952&GAID=13&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB2952.htm |