IL SB2952 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1106
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1106
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Self-Service Storage Facility Act. Provides that the term "last known address" includes electronic mail addresses. Defines "verified mail" and "electronic mail". Provides that notice under the Act shall be delivered by verified mail or by electronic mail (instead of "by certified mail or by first-class mail with a certificate of mailing") to the last known address of the occupant. Provides that a notice sent by electronic mail is presumed delivered when the owner receives a receipt of delivery to the occupant's last known address. Provides that the advertising requirements of the sale or other disposition to enforce the lien may be met in any commercially reasonable manner, and that the manner of advertisement shall be deemed commercially reasonable if at least 3 independent bidders attend the sale. Provides that a sale shall be deemed to be held at the self-service storage facility where the personal property is stored if the sale is held on a publicly accessible online website.
Title
STORAGE LIENS: E-ENFORCEMENT
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Jacobs [D] | Rep. Louis Lang [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 36 N: 11 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 36 N: 11 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-26 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1106 |
2014-08-26 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2015 |
2014-08-26 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2014-06-27 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2014-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 051-000-000 |
2014-05-28 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Judiciary; 009-000-000 |
2014-05-27 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Judiciary |
2014-05-22 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2014-05-22 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Mike Jacobs |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 23, 2014 |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2014-05-22 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-006-001 |
2014-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-20 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-20 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary; 012-000-000 |
2014-05-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary; by Voice Vote |
2014-05-16 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 23, 2014 |
2014-05-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary |
2014-05-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-05-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang |
2014-05-14 | House | Assigned to Judiciary |
2014-05-01 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-05-01 | House | First Reading |
2014-05-01 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2014-05-01 | House | Arrived in House |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 036-011-000 |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Jacobs |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Jacobs |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 008-000-000 |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 1, 2014 |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mike Jacobs |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 008-000-000 |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mike Jacobs |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 5, 2014 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 27, 2014 |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 010-000-000 |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mike Jacobs |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
770 | 95 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
770 | 95 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |