IL SB2944 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Aid to the Aged, Blind, or Disabled Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Requires the Department of Human Services to increase the sheltered care rates in effect on June 30, 2021 by 5%. Effective immediately.
Title
DHS-AABD-SHELTERED CARE RATES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 To Appropriations- Human Services |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Appropriations |
2022-01-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2022-01-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Doris Turner |
2022-01-05 | Senate | To Appropriations- Human Services |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Assigned to Appropriations |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-10-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Doris Turner |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 3-2.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |