IL SB2944 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-08 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0542
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-08 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0542
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Insurance Code. Includes within the definition of "company action level event" the filing of an RBC report by a health organization that indicates that the health organization has total adjusted capital that is greater than or equal to its company action level RBC but less than the product of its authorized control level RBC and 3.0 and triggers the trend test determined in accordance with the trend test calculation included in the Health RBC Instructions. Effective immediately.
Title
INS CD-COMPANY ACTION LEVEL
Sponsors
Sen. Matt Murphy [R] | Rep. Dan Brady [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-08 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0542 |
2016-07-08 | Senate | Effective Date July 8, 2016 |
2016-07-08 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2016-06-21 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-23 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2016-05-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2016-05-18 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-18 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-11 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-10 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Insurance Committee; 019-000-000 |
2016-05-02 | House | Assigned to Insurance Committee |
2016-04-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-21 | House | First Reading |
2016-04-21 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2016-04-21 | House | Arrived in House |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 21, 2016 |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 7, 2016 |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Do Pass Insurance; 011-000-000 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-02-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Matt Murphy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 5 | 35A-15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |