IL SB2937 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Provides that a guidance counselor may not intentionally solicit or accept any gift from any prohibited source or solicit or accept a gift that would be in violation of any federal or State statute or rule, with exceptions; defines terms. Provides that a guidance counselor is not in violation of the prohibition if he or she promptly takes reasonable action to return the gift to the prohibited source or donates the gift or an amount equal to its value to an appropriate charity that is exempt from income taxation under the Internal Revenue Code of 1986. Provides that a guidance counselor or prohibited source who intentionally violates the prohibition is guilty of a business offense and is subject to a fine of at least $1,001 and up to $5,000.
Title
SCH CD-COUNSELOR-GIFT BAN
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-03-04 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | First Reading |
2020-03-04 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2020-03-04 | House | Arrived in House |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 25, 2020 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 19, 2020 |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Do Pass Higher Education; 010-000-000 |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Assigned to Higher Education |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan McConchie |