IL SB2924 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on December 1 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-29 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act. Provides that the Department of Revenue may furnish certain financial information to municipalities and home rule units (currently, municipalities only). Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ROTA-INFORMATION SHARING

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-12-01 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-01 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-12-29SenateSent to the Governor
2016-12-01SenatePassed Both Houses
2016-12-01SenateSenate Concurs
2016-12-01SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 054-000-000
2016-12-01SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 054-000-000
2016-12-01Senate3/5 Vote Required
2016-11-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2016-11-30SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2016-11-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2016-11-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. John M. Sullivan
2016-11-30SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2016-11-30SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. John M. Sullivan
2016-11-29SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John M. Sullivan
2016-11-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - November 29, 2016
2016-11-16SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2
2016-11-16HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-000
2016-11-16House3/5 Vote Required
2016-11-16HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2016-11-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2016-11-16HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2016-11-15HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 010-000-000
2016-11-15HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. John Bradley
2016-11-14HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
2016-11-14HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2016-11-14HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. John Bradley
2016-11-14HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2016-11-14HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000
2016-06-30HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2016-05-31HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2016
2016-05-27HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2016
2016-05-26HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2016-05-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2016-05-12HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2016-05-12HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 013-000-000
2016-05-12HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Revenue & Finance Committee; by Voice Vote
2016-05-12HouseRemains in Revenue & Finance Committee
2016-05-12HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 005-000-000
2016-05-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
2016-05-03HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2016-05-03HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2016-05-03HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2016-04-27HouseTo Sales and Other Taxes Subcommittee
2016-04-18HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2016-04-07HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2016-04-07HouseFirst Reading
2016-04-07HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2016-04-07HouseArrived in House
2016-04-07SenateThird Reading - Passed; 051-000-000
2016-03-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 5, 2016
2016-03-17SenateSecond Reading
2016-03-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2016
2016-03-10SenateDo Pass Revenue; 009-000-000
2016-03-02SenateAssigned to Revenue
2016-02-18SenateReferred to Assignments
2016-02-18SenateFirst Reading
2016-02-18SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3512011Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2924&GAID=13&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=88&GA=99
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB2924.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB2924eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB2924enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB2924ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB2924ham002.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/99/senate/09900SB2924_04072016_006000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/99/house/09900SB2924_11162016_005000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/99/senate/09900SB2924_12012016_007001C.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/99/senate/09900SB2924_12012016_007000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback