IL SB2922 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 3, 2024
Pending: Senate Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 3, 2024
Pending: Senate Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Provides a tax credit for certain developers of single-family residences that incur development costs and that sell or rent qualified residences to individuals who meet certain income thresholds. Sets forth the amount of the credit. Effective immediately.
Title
INC TX-HOUSING DEVELOPMENT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 3, 2024 |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 5, 2024 |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-01-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael W. Halpin |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2922&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SB/10300SB2922.htm |