IL SB2921 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Vetoed on August 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-28 - Bill Dead - Amendatory Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on August 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-28 - Bill Dead - Amendatory Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Treasurer Act. Modifies and reorganizes the provisions of a Section concerning the College Savings Pool. Provides that the State Treasurer may establish and administer a College Savings Pool as a qualified tuition program under the Internal Revenue Code, and that the Pool may consist of one or more college savings programs. Provides that the State Treasurer, in administering the College Savings Pool, may receive, hold, and invest moneys paid into the Pool and perform such other actions as are necessary to ensure that the Pool operates as a qualified tuition program under the Internal Revenue Code. Provides provisions concerning administration, availability, fees, and investment restrictions of the Pool. Modifies the way in which investments, distributions, contributions, and bonds are made regarding the Pool. Defines terms. Makes conforming, technical, and other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
TREASURER-COLLEGE SAVINGS POOL
Sponsors
Sen. William Cunningham [D] | Sen. Patricia Van Pelt [D] | Sen. Laura Murphy [D] | Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] |
Sen. Cristina Castro [D] | Sen. Kimberly Lightford [D] | Rep. Emanuel Welch [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 101 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 101 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-28 | Senate | Bill Dead - Amendatory Veto |
2018-11-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Amendatory Veto November 14, 2018 |
2018-08-28 | Senate | Governor Amendatory Veto |
2018-06-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 049-000-000 |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2018-05-31 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 101-013-000 |
2018-05-31 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2018-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2018-05-29 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-29 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-05-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-29 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2018-05-28 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2018-05-28 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Executive Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2018-05-28 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-28 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2018-04-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-24 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-24 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2018-04-18 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2018 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2018 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Do Pass State Government; 006-000-000 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 505 | 16.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |