IL SB2915 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0720
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0720
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. Provides that the minor who is the subject of record, his or her parents, guardian, and counsel shall have the right to inspect and copy law enforcement records maintained by a law enforcement agency or record of municipal ordinance violations maintained by any State, local, or municipal agency that relate to a minor who has been investigated, arrested, or taken into custody before his or her 18th birthday. Provides that public defenders shall have access to these law enforcement and juvenile court records under specified circumstances. Makes changes to the juvenile court and law enforcement juvenile records expungement procedures. Effective immediately.
Title
JUV CT-EXPUNGE-CONFIDENTIAL
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 81 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-03 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0720 |
2018-08-03 | Senate | Effective Date August 3, 2018 |
2018-08-03 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-25 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 081-029-000 |
2018-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-15 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-000-000 |
2018-05-09 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2018-05-08 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2018-05-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-08 | House | First Reading |
2018-05-01 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2018-04-24 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 045-000-000 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Mulroe |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 011-000-000 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 13, 2018 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 28, 2018 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 010-000-000 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
705 | 405 | 1-7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
705 | 405 | 1-8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
705 | 405 | 5-915 | Amended Code | Citation Text |