IL SB2908 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on August 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0719
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on August 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0719
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Universal Telephone Service Protection Law of 1985 of the Public Utilities Act. Requires a Large Electing Provider to provide the required statement in a notice of proposed cessation of requested service to existing customers in English and in Spanish. Effective immediately.
Title
UTILITY-NOTICE IN SPANISH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 88 N: 17 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-03 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0719 |
2018-08-03 | Senate | Effective Date August 3, 2018 |
2018-08-03 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-25 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 088-017-000 |
2018-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2018-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2018-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2018-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2018-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2018-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-15 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Public Utilities Committee; 014-000-000 |
2018-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2018-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2018-05-09 | House | Assigned to Public Utilities Committee |
2018-05-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-08 | House | First Reading |
2018-05-03 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2018-04-23 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 044-001-000 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2018 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 17, 2018 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Do Pass Telecommunications and Information Technology; 011-000-000 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Telecommunications and Information Technology |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
220 | 5 | 13-406.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |