IL SB2907 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0718
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0718
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Identification Act. Provides agencies and entities in this State authorized by law to conduct or obtain national criminal history background checks for persons shall be eligible to participate in the Federal Rap Back Service administered by the Department of State Police. Provides the Department of State Police may submit fingerprints to the Federal Bureau of Investigation Rap Back Service to be retained in the Federal Bureau of Investigation Rap Back Service for the purpose of being searched by future submissions to the Federal Bureau of Investigation Rap Back Service, including latent fingerprint searches and to collect all Federal Rap Back Service fees from eligible agencies and entities wishing to participate in the Rap Back Service and remit those fees to the Federal Bureau of Investigation. Allows the Department of State Police to adopt any rules necessary for implementation of this provision. Defines "national criminal history record check" and "Rap Back Service".
Title
STATE POLICE-RAP BACK SERVICE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-03 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0718 |
2018-08-03 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-03 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel |
2018-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-25 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-002-001 |
2018-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-23 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-23 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-22 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-000-000 |
2018-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2018-05-14 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2018-05-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-10 | House | First Reading |
2018-05-09 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2018-05-09 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2018 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 11, 2018 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 24, 2018 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 23, 2018 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 010-000-000 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Karen McConnaughay |