IL SB2903 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-31 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-31 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Illinois State Fairgrounds Foundation Act. Establishes the Illinois State Fairgrounds Foundation under the authority of the Department of Agriculture. Sets forth the Foundation's purposes, organization, powers, and duties. Provides that the Foundation must provide a written notice to any entity providing a gift, grant, or bequest to the Foundation that the Foundation is not subject to the Public Funds Investment Act. Provides that the Foundation shall be considered a public body under the Prevailing Wage Act. Provides that any project, including but not limited to improvement, maintenance, and construction of infrastructure, that is funded in whole or in part by the Foundation shall be considered a public work as defined by the Prevailing Wage Act. Amends the Illinois Procurement Code. Provides that the Code does not apply to procurement expenditures by the Illinois State Fairgrounds Foundation when only private funds are used. Effective immediately.
Title
STATE FAIRGROUNDS FOUNDATION
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Brady [R] | Sen. Chuck Weaver [R] | Sen. William McCann [R] | Sen. David Luechtefeld [R] |
Sen. Emil Jones [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-31 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2016-07-31 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2016 |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2016-05-16 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 27, 2016 |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 13, 2016 |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 20, 2016 |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Executive |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 7, 2016 |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 014-000-000 |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David S. Luechtefeld |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-02-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. William E. Brady |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 500 | 1-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |