IL SB2903 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Illinois State Fairgrounds Foundation Act. Establishes the Illinois State Fairgrounds Foundation under the authority of the Department of Agriculture. Sets forth the Foundation's purposes, organization, powers, and duties. Provides that the Foundation must provide a written notice to any entity providing a gift, grant, or bequest to the Foundation that the Foundation is not subject to the Public Funds Investment Act. Effective immediately.
Title
STATE FAIRGROUNDS FOUNDATION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 44 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2014-04-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-04-03 | House | First Reading |
2014-04-03 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Raymond Poe |
2014-04-03 | House | Arrived in House |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-5(a) |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 044-011-000 |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 2, 2014 |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Manar |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Agriculture and Conservation; 007-001-000 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Agriculture and Conservation |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Gary Forby |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 4, 2014 |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 27, 2014 |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Do Pass Agriculture and Conservation; 007-000-001 |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Postponed - Agriculture and Conservation |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Assigned to Agriculture and Conservation |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar |