IL SB2892 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Provides that, beginning July 1, 2019, in fixing the salaries of teachers, a school board shall pay those who serve on a full-time basis a rate not less than $40,000 per year. Removes a provision providing for a periodic teacher salary increase schedule. Makes conforming changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-TEACHER SALARY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2018
2018-04-24SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-24SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018
2018-04-11SenateDo Pass as Amended Education; 007-004-000
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
2018-04-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar
2018-03-14SenatePostponed - Education
2018-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-02-28SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-02-27SenatePostponed - Education
2018-02-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-02-22SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2018-02-21SenateAssigned to Education
2018-02-20SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-02-14SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-14SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-14SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105524-8Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback