IL SB2892 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-2)
Status: Enrolled on May 30 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Provides that, beginning July 1, 2019, in fixing the salaries of teachers, a school board shall pay those who serve on a full-time basis a rate not less than $40,000 per year. Removes a provision providing for a periodic teacher salary increase schedule. Makes conforming changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-TEACHER SALARY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 65 N: 47 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 37 N: 16 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2018-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2018-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2018-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2018-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-05-30SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-30HouseThird Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 065-047-000
2018-05-30HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
2018-05-30HouseRemoved from Short Debate Status
2018-05-30HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-29HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-29HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-29HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 005-003-000
2018-05-28HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2018-05-28HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2018-05-28HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-28HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2018-05-22SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2018-05-18SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
2018-05-18HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-05-18HouseFirst Reading
2018-05-17HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2018-05-17HouseArrived in House
2018-05-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
2018-05-17SenateThird Reading - Passed; 037-016-000
2018-05-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-05-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Manar
2018-05-17SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-05-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2018-05-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul
2018-05-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 008-002-000
2018-05-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Education
2018-05-11SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar
2018-05-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2018
2018-05-08SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2018-05-08SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 11, 2018
2018-05-03SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2018-04-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2018
2018-04-24SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-24SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018
2018-04-11SenateDo Pass as Amended Education; 007-004-000
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
2018-04-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar
2018-03-14SenatePostponed - Education
2018-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-02-28SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-02-27SenatePostponed - Education
2018-02-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-02-22SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2018-02-21SenateAssigned to Education
2018-02-20SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-02-14SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-14SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-14SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105524-8Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback