IL SB2890 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Full and Fair Noneconomic Damages Act. Provides that, in determining noneconomic damages, the fact-finder may not consider: (i) evidence of a defendant's alleged wrongdoing, misconduct, or guilt; (ii) evidence of the defendant's wealth or financial resources; or (iii) any other evidence that is offered for the purpose of punishing the defendant, rather than offered for a compensatory purpose. Provides for bifurcated trials before the same jury in cases involving punitive damages, if requested by any defendant. Outlines the procedure for the bifurcated trials. Provides for court posttrial review of noneconomic damage awards pursuant to specified nonexclusive factors. Includes legislative findings, definitions, and applicability language. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FULL & FAIR NONECONOMIC DAMAGE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2025-01-07SenateSession Sine Die
2024-04-19SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2024-04-12SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2024
2024-04-05SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 19, 2024
2024-03-15SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 5, 2024
2024-02-21SenateTo Subcommittee on Special Issues
2024-02-06SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2024-01-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2024-01-24SenateFirst Reading
2024-01-24SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Jil Tracy

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback