IL SB2889 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
REVENUE-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 1, 2014 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 8, 2014 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 1, 2014 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Revenue; 011-000-000 |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Revenue |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 5 | 101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |