IL SB2887 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-22 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-22 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Consumer Fraud and Deceptive Business Practices Act in relation to patent infringement claims. Provides that it is unlawful to make bad faith patent claims rather than to issue unfair or deceptive patent infringement demand letters. Defines terms. Provides that a target of a bad faith patent claim may obtain equitable relief, damages, costs, attorney's fees, and punitive damages. Provides that a target may seek to require the person making the patent infringement claim to post a bond. Sets forth criteria for determining whether a claim is a bad faith claim. Authorizes the Attorney General to bring an action to enjoin violations.
Title
CONS FRAUD-PATENT-BAD FAITH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-22 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 22, 2016 |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-02-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
815 | 505 | 2SSS | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2887&GAID=13&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB2887.htm |