IL SB2884 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on December 1 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-29 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Legislative Commission Reorganization Act of 1984 by repealing Sections concerning the Advisory Committee on Block Grants.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

BLOCK GRANT ADVIS CMTE REPEAL

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-12-01 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-01 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-12-29SenateSent to the Governor
2016-12-01SenatePassed Both Houses
2016-12-01SenateSenate Concurs
2016-12-01SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 053-000-000
2016-12-01SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 053-000-000
2016-12-01Senate3/5 Vote Required
2016-11-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2016-11-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2016-11-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2016-11-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2016-11-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2016-11-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2016-11-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - November 30, 2016
2016-11-29SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2
2016-11-29HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
2016-11-29House3/5 Vote Required
2016-11-29HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2016-11-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2016-11-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2016-11-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000
2016-11-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2016-11-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William Davis
2016-11-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
2016-11-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2016-11-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William Davis
2016-11-15HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2016-11-15HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2016-11-15HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2016-11-15HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 010-000-000
2016-11-09HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2016-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris
2016-05-10HouseAlternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. David Harris
2016-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris
2016-05-03HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2016-05-03HouseFirst Reading
2016-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2016-04-22HouseArrived in House
2016-04-21SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2016-04-21SenateThird Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
2016-04-21SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2016-04-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted; Althoff
2016-04-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Althoff
2016-04-21SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2016-04-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommend Do Adopt State Government and Veterans Affairs; 007-000-000
2016-04-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt State Government and Veterans Affairs; 007-000-000
2016-04-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Assignments Refers to State Government and Veterans Affairs
2016-04-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to State Government and Veterans Affairs
2016-04-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2016
2016-04-18SenateSecond Reading
2016-04-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments
2016-04-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2016-04-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2016-04-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2016-04-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2016-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 7, 2016
2016-04-06SenateDo Pass as Amended State Government and Veterans Affairs; 006-000-000
2016-04-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2016-04-05SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to State Government and Veterans Affairs
2016-04-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2016-04-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2016-03-30SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government and Veterans Affairs
2016-03-17SenatePostponed - State Government and Veterans Affairs
2016-03-16SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2016-03-16SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2016-03-10SenatePostponed - State Government and Veterans Affairs
2016-03-02SenateAssigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs
2016-02-23SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2016-02-17SenateReferred to Assignments
2016-02-17SenateFirst Reading
2016-02-17SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
251304-4Repealed CodeCitation Text
251304-5Repealed CodeCitation Text
251304-6Repealed CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2884&GAID=13&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=88&GA=99
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB2884.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB2884eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB2884enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB2884sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB2884sam002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB2884sam003.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB2884sam004.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB2884ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB2884ham002.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/99/senate/09900SB2884_04212016_044000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/99/house/09900SB2884_11292016_004000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/99/senate/09900SB2884_12012016_004001C.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/99/senate/09900SB2884_12012016_004000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback