IL SB2879 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that a Section of the Code requiring tax purchasers to either reimburse any governmental agency that has an interest in the property as a result of certain advancements made from public funds or obtain a waiver of the lien applies to (i) interests held by the State as well as cities, villages, incorporated towns, and other units of local government that provide water or sewer service and (ii) interests based on the provision of water or sewer services.
Title
PROP TX-REIMBURSE-LIENS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2012-04-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2012-04-26 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2012-03-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As April 26, 2012 |
2012-03-27 | Senate | To Judiciary Subcommittee on Property and Environment |
2012-03-09 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 30, 2012 |
2012-03-07 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2012-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Judiciary |
2012-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2012-03-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2012-03-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William Delgado |
2012-02-28 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2012-02-23 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2012-02-07 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2012-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2012-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2012-02-01 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. William Delgado |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 22-35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |