IL SB2873 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that, if a veteran (i) was a member of the United States Armed Forces, (ii) is 70 years of age or older during the taxable year, and (iii) has a household income of less than $65,000, then property that is used as a qualified residence by the veteran is exempt from taxation under the Code. Effective immediately.
Title
PROP TX-VETERANS
Sponsors
Sen. Terry Link [D] | Sen. Emil Jones [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 15-169 | Amended Code | Citation Text |