IL SB2866 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that whenever the State determines that asset verification is necessary for a determination of eligibility on the basis of being aged, blind, or disabled, the Department of Healthcare and Family Services shall require the applicant for or recipient of medical assistance and any other person whose resources are required by law to be disclosed to determine the eligibility of the applicant or recipient for such assistance to provide authorization for the State to obtain any financial records held by any financial institution with respect to the applicant's or recipient's or such other person's resources, as applicable, from any financial institution holding such records. Provides that the Department shall pay a reasonable fee, not to exceed the actual cost incurred, to the financial institution producing the records. Provides that the records shall be produced at no cost to the applicant, recipient, or such other person. Defines "financial institution" and "financial records". Amends the Illinois Banking Act, the Illinois Savings and Loan Act of 1985, the Savings Bank Act, and the Illinois Credit Union Act. Permits the financial institutions subject to those Acts to furnish information in accordance with the federal requirement of asset verification as set forth in the Social Security Act and pursuant to authorization by a medical assistance applicant or recipient or by any other person whose resources are required by law to be disclosed to determine the eligibility of the applicant or recipient for such assistance.
Title
MEDICAID-ASSET VERIFY-BANK RCD
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 11, 2014 |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
205 | 105 | 3-8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
205 | 205 | 4013 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
205 | 305 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
205 | 5 | 48.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 11-5.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2866&GAID=12&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/SB/09800SB2866.htm |