IL SB2865 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Administrative Act and the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that the Department of Human Services shall progressively increase rates and reimbursements so that by July 1, 2018 direct support persons earn a base wage of not less than $5.25 per hour above the highest of the federal, State, county, or municipal minimum wages, and so that other front-line personnel earn a commensurate wage, and by July 1, 2020 direct support persons earn a base wage of not less than $6.75 per hour above the highest of the federal, State, county, or municipal minimum wages. Effective immediately.
Title
DEV DISABILITIES WORKERS-WAGES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 1705 | 55.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
305 | 5 | 5-5.4j | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2865&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2865.htm |